Port of corpus christi commissioner
WebJan 5, 2024 · CORPUS CHRISTI, Texas — Former San Antonio City Council member Diane Gonzalez was appointed as the Port of Corpus Christi Authority's newest commissioner … WebMar 22, 2024 · Following a heated discussion about how the draft came about, the City Council voted 7-2 in favor of a motion by At-Large Councilman Mike Pusley, who collaborated with port commissioners...
Port of corpus christi commissioner
Did you know?
WebThe board of pilot commissioners for the Port of Corpus Christi is composed of the seven port commissioners for the Port of Corpus Christi Authority. Added by Acts 1997, 75th Leg., ch. 359, Sec. 4, eff. Sept. 1, 1997. Sec. 70.012. PROHIBITED INTEREST. WebApr 1, 2024 · The listing broker’s offer of compensation is made only to participants of the MLS where the listing is filed. 7477 State Highway 361 #502, Corpus Christi, TX 78418 is a 2 bedroom, 3 bathroom, 1,511 sqft condo built in 1984. This property is currently available for sale and was listed by Corpus Christi AOR on Apr 1, 2024.
WebJul 25, 2024 · Port of Corpus Christi Commission Chairman Charlie Zahn and Sarah Garza, the port's director of environmental planning and compliance, at a July 19 Port Aransas City Council meeting. Zahn sat down for an interview with South Jetty reporters on Wednesday, July 18. (Staff photo by Dan Parker, © 2024.) This is an interview conducted with Web(2) the city council of the City of Corpus Christi shall appoint three port commissioners; and (3) the Commissioners Court of San Patricio County shall appoint one port commissioner. …
WebCorpus Christi, Texas, United States Assisted the Communications Department with producing, formatting, and editing communication pieces, including Commission … WebApr 2, 2024 · Dr. Bryan Gulley sworn in as new Port of Corpus Christi Commissioner Dr. Bryan Gulley will serve the remainder of Richard Bowers' term on the Port Commission …
WebDec 29, 2024 · The Port of Corpus Christi did not reply for comment. After several rounds of voting by the city council, Valls did make it to the final round but was ultimately defeated by new Port Commissioner Gabe Guerra. The Corpus Christi resident is president and CEO of Kleberg Bank. •[email protected]• Recommended for you Gabe Guerra 2024 Sun …
WebDec 9, 2024 · The Port of Corpus Christi Authority is governed by a commission of seven members who each serve three-year terms. Three are appointed by the Corpus Christi City Council, three by... tsm twitter lolWebPrecinct 4 encompasses all of Port Aransas, North Padre Island and Flour Bluff and includes parts of the Southside of Corpus Christi from Ocean Drive to the London Independent School District. Commissioner Chesney previously served as the Presiding Judge for Nueces County Court at Law Number 5. phim together nettsmt trucking joplin moWebDec 16, 2024 · Here's who the City Council chose as the new Port of Corpus Christi commissioner Kathryn Cargo, Corpus Christi Caller Times December 16, 2024, 4:21 AM · 5 min read Gabe Guerra, of Corpus... tsm twitter bannerWeb“The Port of Corpus Christi is thrilled to collaborate with The University of Texas at Austin on this milestone project,” said Jeffrey Pollack, Chief Strategy and Sustainability Officer for ... phim to fly with youWebDec 9, 2015 · December 09, 2015. Rick Valls Jr. was unanimously reappointed to the Port of Corpus Christi commission by the city council Dec. 8 to serve a full three-year term. His original appointment two years ago was to serve out the remaining term of resigning commissioner Bob Kostelnik. Valls is the owner and vice president of Valls International, a … phim together with me phần 2WebCorpus Christi, Texas, United States Assisted the Communications Department with producing, formatting, and editing communication pieces, including Commission … tsm twitch